AR HB2266 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-03 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish A Uniform Standard For Data Collection Among Law Enforcement Agencies.
Title
To Establish A Uniform Standard For Data Collection Among Law Enforcement Agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-04-03 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2266 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB2266.pdf |