AR HB2252 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2252 is now Act 1511
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2252 is now Act 1511
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Certain Laws Concerning Water Quality Standards; To Improve The Process For Refining And Revising Water Quality Standards; And To Create Cost-effective Attainment Strategies.
Title
To Amend Certain Laws Concerning Water Quality Standards; To Improve The Process For Refining And Revising Water Quality Standards; And To Create Cost-effective Attainment Strategies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 15 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Notification that HB2252 is now Act 1511 |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed, Emergency Clause having Failed of Adoption |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Emergency Clause Failed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-12 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-12 | House | Rep. Harris served notice that he will within the time prescribed move to reconsider the vote by which the Emergency Clause on HB2252 failed to pass. |
2013-04-11 | House | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2013-04-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-04-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |