AR HB2242 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 Concerning Data Related To A Public Water System Or Municipally Owned Utility System.
Title
To Amend The Freedom Of Information Act Of 1967 Concerning Data Related To A Public Water System Or Municipally Owned Utility System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT''L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |