AR HB2207 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Abolish The Allocation Of Enrollment Positions At The University Of Arkansas College Of Medicine Based On Congressional District And Arkansas Residency.
Title
To Abolish The Allocation Of Enrollment Positions At The University Of Arkansas College Of Medicine Based On Congressional District And Arkansas Residency.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 8 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Motion to reconsider HB2207 by Rep. Michelle Gray Passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 46 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Motion to reconsider HB2207 by Rep. Michelle Gray Passed (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 46 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | MOTION made for immediate consideration. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-20 | House | Motion to reconsider HB2207 by Rep. Michelle Gray Passed |
2017-03-17 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |