AR HB2199 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2199 is now Act 1510
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding The Alzheimer's Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding The Alzheimer's Advisory Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseNotification that HB2199 is now Act 1510
2013-04-18HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-17HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-17HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-04-17SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-04-17SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-16SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-04-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-04-04SenateReceived from the House.
2013-04-04HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback