AR HB2197 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on HOUSE RULES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on HOUSE RULES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding The Operations Of Retail Liquor Stores And Liquor Distributors.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding The Operations Of Retail Liquor Stores And Liquor Distributors.
Sponsors
Sen. Clint Penzo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-30 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2017-03-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2197 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB2197.pdf |