AR HB2196 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that HB2196 is now Act 1509
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Right Of The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality And An Owner Or Operator To Access Property For Purposes Of Investigation, Site Assessment, Or Corrective Action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Right Of The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality And An Owner Or Operator To Access Property For Purposes Of Investigation, Site Assessment, Or Corrective Action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseNotification that HB2196 is now Act 1509
2013-04-19HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2013-04-18HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2013-04-18HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2013-04-18SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2013-04-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
2013-03-26SenateReceived from the House.
2013-03-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-03-22HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-03-22HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2013-03-22HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2013-03-21HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2013-03-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2013-03-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback