AR HB2182 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2182 is now Act 1036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2182 is now Act 1036
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Modify The Process By Which The State Highway Commission May Sell Or Dispose Of Surplus Property.
Title
To Modify The Process By Which The State Highway Commission May Sell Or Dispose Of Surplus Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Notification that HB2182 is now Act 1036 |
2017-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-14 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |