AR HB2169 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB2169 is now Act 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB2169 is now Act 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Transfer Oversight Of The Arkansas Entertainers Hall Of Fame To The Advertising And Tourist Promotion Commission Of The City Of Pine Bluff, Arkansas.
Title
To Transfer Oversight Of The Arkansas Entertainers Hall Of Fame To The Advertising And Tourist Promotion Commission Of The City Of Pine Bluff, Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Notification that HB2169 is now Act 776 |
2017-03-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |