AR HB2167 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - House Notification that HB2167 is now Act 1230
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - House Notification that HB2167 is now Act 1230
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend The Membership Of The Arkansas Hiv-aids Minority Task Force.
Title
An Act To Amend The Membership Of The Arkansas Hiv-aids Minority Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | House Notification that HB2167 is now Act 1230 | |
2011-04-04 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-04-01 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-04-01 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-16 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-15 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |