AR HB2153 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Title 3 Of The Arkansas Code Regarding Permits For Alcoholic Beverage Businesses.
Title
To Amend Title 3 Of The Arkansas Code Regarding Permits For Alcoholic Beverage Businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - MOTION to suspend the rules FAILED. (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | MOTION to suspend the rules FAILED. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-31 | House | Ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Read the third time and passed |
2017-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2017-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-14 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |