AR HB2136 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - House Returned From the Senate having failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-29 - House Returned From the Senate having failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require All Public Pools To Be Maintained Under The Supervision Or Direction Of A Certified Pool Operator.
Title
An Act To Require All Public Pools To Be Maintained Under The Supervision Or Direction Of A Certified Pool Operator.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hyde [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. (Y: 2 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | House Returned From the Senate having failed to pass. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and failed. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-18 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2011-03-18 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |