AR HB2128 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB2128 is now Act 1358
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB2128 is now Act 1358
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Revise And Simplify The Tracking Of And Accounting For Interscholastic Athletic Programs And Interscholastic Activity Program Funds.
Title
To Revise And Simplify The Tracking Of And Accounting For Interscholastic Athletic Programs And Interscholastic Activity Program Funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Notification that HB2128 is now Act 1358 |
2013-04-17 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |