AR HB2122 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish A Pilot Program To Provide Assistance To Fire Departments That Improve Insurance Services Office Rating; And To Expand The Duties Of The Arkansas Department Of Emergency Management.
Title
To Establish A Pilot Program To Provide Assistance To Fire Departments That Improve Insurance Services Office Rating; And To Expand The Duties Of The Arkansas Department Of Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in House at Sine Die |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2122 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB2122.pdf |