AR HB2112 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning A Person Who Fails To Appear Or Fails To Pay A Fine; Concerning The Offense Of Failure To Appear; And Concerning Costs, Fines, And Fees Assessed To A Person Who Is Incarcerated Or In A Hospital Or Inpatient Facility.
Title
Concerning A Person Who Fails To Appear Or Fails To Pay A Fine; Concerning The Offense Of Failure To Appear; And Concerning Costs, Fines, And Fees Assessed To A Person Who Is Incarcerated Or In A Hospital Or Inpatient Facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |