AR HB2096 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB2096 is now Act 1191
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB2096 is now Act 1191
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding The Salaries Of Personnel And Other Requirements Of Various District Courts.
Title
Regarding The Salaries Of Personnel And Other Requirements Of Various District Courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | House Notification that HB2096 is now Act 1191 | |
2011-04-01 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-31 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | House Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 | |
2011-03-30 | House Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned To the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-28 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-25 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-25 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-25 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-24 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 | |
2011-03-15 | House Transfer to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-15 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-15 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |