AR HB2057 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB2057 is now Act 1097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB2057 is now Act 1097
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Speed Limits.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Speed Limits.
Sponsors
Rep. Deann Vaught [R] | Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R] | Sen. Justin Boyd [R] | Rep. Grant Hodges [R] |
Sen. John Payton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Notification that HB2057 is now Act 1097 |
2017-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Receded from Amendment No. 2 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | EXPUNGE passage of HB 2057 on March 27, 2017. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2017-03-29 | House | The votes by which Senate amendments I and 2 passed were expunged. |
2017-03-29 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-29 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-29 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 & 2 |
2017-03-27 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-03-13 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-10 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |