AR HB2003 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Offenses Domestic Battering In The Second Degree And Aggravated Assault On A Family Or Household Member And To Make Technical Corrections.
Title
To Amend The Offenses Domestic Battering In The Second Degree And Aggravated Assault On A Family Or Household Member And To Make Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-21 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |