AR HB2001 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Stimulate Job Creation And Economic Development While Preserving Health And Safety Standards; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Stimulate Job Creation And Economic Development While Preserving Health And Safety Standards; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Womack [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Rep. Mickey Gates [R] | Sen. John Payton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2001 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HB2001.pdf |