AR HB1999 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1999 is now Act 1355
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1999 is now Act 1355
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Limit The Number Of Special License Plates Issued By The Department Of Finance And Administration.
Title
To Limit The Number Of Special License Plates Issued By The Department Of Finance And Administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Nate Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - The vote by which Amendment #1 passed was expunged. (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - The vote by which Amendment #1 passed was expunged. (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Notification that HB1999 is now Act 1355 |
2013-04-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-10 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-04 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-04 | House | The vote by which Amendment #1 passed was expunged. |
2013-04-04 | House | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |