AR HB1980 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1980 is now Act 1071
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Unfair Cigarette Sales Act; To Amend The Arkansas Tobacco Products Tax Act Of 1977; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Unfair Cigarette Sales Act; To Amend The Arkansas Tobacco Products Tax Act Of 1977; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Emergency clause failed of adoption (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseNotification that HB1980 is now Act 1071
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-10HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-10SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-09SenateRe-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-09SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-09SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-09SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-09HouseEmergency clause failed of adoption
2019-04-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-09HouseMotion by Representative Beck to reconsider HB1980 passed
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-04-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-04-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback