AR HB1980 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1980 is now Act 1071
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1980 is now Act 1071
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Unfair Cigarette Sales Act; To Amend The Arkansas Tobacco Products Tax Act Of 1977; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend The Unfair Cigarette Sales Act; To Amend The Arkansas Tobacco Products Tax Act Of 1977; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Emergency clause failed of adoption (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Emergency clause failed of adoption (Y: 66 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Notification that HB1980 is now Act 1071 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-10 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-10 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-09 | House | Emergency clause failed of adoption |
2019-04-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-04-09 | House | Motion by Representative Beck to reconsider HB1980 passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-04-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2019-04-02 | House | Filed |