AR HB1978 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Statutes Concerning Procurers; And To Regulate The Use Of A Procurer By A Licensed Chiropractic Physician.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Statutes Concerning Procurers; And To Regulate The Use Of A Procurer By A Licensed Chiropractic Physician.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate as requested.
2019-04-09SenateReturned To the House as requested.
2019-04-08SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-08SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-04-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-02HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback