AR HB1975 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB1975 is now Act 1181
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB1975 is now Act 1181
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require A Criminal Background Check By A Private Business That Provides Short-term Child Care Facilities For Its Patrons.
Title
To Require A Criminal Background Check By A Private Business That Provides Short-term Child Care Facilities For Its Patrons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | House Notification that HB1975 is now Act 1181 | |
2011-04-01 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-31 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-29 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-28 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-28 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-28 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-25 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 | |
2011-03-21 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-21 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-21 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |