AR HB1974 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Notification that HB1974 is now Act 1001
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Notification that HB1974 is now Act 1001
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Transport Of Sparkling Wine In Arkansas.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Transport Of Sparkling Wine In Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1974 is now Act 1001 |
2013-04-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Held in Chamber |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-19 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |