AR HB1960 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning Counting Votes For Withdrawn Or Deceased Candidates; And To Streamline Certain Election Processes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning Counting Votes For Withdrawn Or Deceased Candidates; And To Streamline Certain Election Processes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseWITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
2019-04-08HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-08HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-08HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-05HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback