AR HB1960 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Notification that HB1960 is now Act 965
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Regulate The Branding And Marking Of Livestock; And To Allow The Arkansas Livestock And Poultry Commission To Contract With A Private Entity To Administer The Requirements For Branding And Marking Livestock.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Regulate The Branding And Marking Of Livestock; And To Allow The Arkansas Livestock And Poultry Commission To Contract With A Private Entity To Administer The Requirements For Branding And Marking Livestock.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-26 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02HouseNotification that HB1960 is now Act 965
2015-03-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2015-03-26HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2015-03-26HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2015-03-25HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2015-03-19HouseRe-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2015-03-19HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2015-03-19SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2015-03-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-19SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-17SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2015-03-16SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development
2015-03-16SenateReceived from the House.
2015-03-13HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-11HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-03-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2015-03-09HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback