AR HB1958 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Credit Repair Services Organization Act Of 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Credit Repair Services Organization Act Of 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-24SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-02SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2019-04-02SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-02HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-01HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback