AR HB1957 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that HB1957 is now Act 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 64-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that HB1957 is now Act 1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Enforcement Of Federal Firearm Bans Within The State Of Arkansas; And Concerning State Constitutional Rights.
Title
Concerning The Enforcement Of Federal Firearm Bans Within The State Of Arkansas; And Concerning State Constitutional Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Notification that HB1957 is now Act 1012 |
2021-04-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-28 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-04-28 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-04-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-04-28 | House | Motion to Suspend the Rules for State Agencies to meet without notice passes |
2021-04-28 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-28 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Returned to the House as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-27 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-26 | House | Filed |