AR HB1955 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Certain Provisions Of The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948; And To Revise Third-party Liability In The Workers' Compensation Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Certain Provisions Of The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948; And To Revise Third-party Liability In The Workers' Compensation Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-05HouseCLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-27HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-27HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback