AR HB1955 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law That Resulted From Initiated Act 1 Of 1988 Concerning Statements Of Financial Interest By State Officials.
Title
To Amend The Law That Resulted From Initiated Act 1 Of 1988 Concerning Statements Of Financial Interest By State Officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in House at Sine Die |
2017-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1955 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HB1955.pdf |