AR HB1938 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1938 is now Act 1081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1938 is now Act 1081
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish Compulsory Training Standards For Public Safety Agencies For The Recognition And Management Of Stress, Self-care Techniques, Mental Health Awareness, And Resiliency.
Title
To Establish Compulsory Training Standards For Public Safety Agencies For The Recognition And Management Of Stress, Self-care Techniques, Mental Health Awareness, And Resiliency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Notification that HB1938 is now Act 1081 |
2021-04-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-15 | House | Filed |