AR HB1937 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Beginning And End Of The School Year.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Beginning And End Of The School Year.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 29 N: 48 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-14 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |