AR HB1930 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Delegate Certain Debt Collection Authority To A Third Party; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration To Delegate Certain Debt Collection Authority To A Third Party; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 35 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 49 N: 32 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-04HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-04HouseMotion by Representative Wardlaw to reconsider HB1930 passed
2019-04-03HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-26HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2019-03-26HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback