AR HB1929 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB1929 is now Act 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB1929 is now Act 801
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Advisory Committee On Public School Academic Facilities; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Advisory Committee On Public School Academic Facilities; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Notification that HB1929 is now Act 801 |
2017-03-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-16 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-15 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |