AR HB1927 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Laws Concerning Load Limits For Vehicles Hauling Certain Agricultural Products.
Title
To Amend The Laws Concerning Load Limits For Vehicles Hauling Certain Agricultural Products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2015-03-16 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1927 |
Text | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HB1927.pdf |