AR HB1922 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1922 is now Act 1484
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1922 is now Act 1484
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Improve Economic Opportunities In Arkansas By Protecting The Water Resources Of The State.
Title
To Improve Economic Opportunities In Arkansas By Protecting The Water Resources Of The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1922 is now Act 1484 |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-18 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-18 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-11 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2013-04-09 | House | Reassigned and transfer to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-04-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |