AR HB1917 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Enact The Religious Freedom Restoration Act And To Provide Remedies And Penalties For Violating Or Abusing Religious Protections Under The Act.
Title
To Enact The Religious Freedom Restoration Act And To Provide Remedies And Penalties For Violating Or Abusing Religious Protections Under The Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Debra Hobbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-21 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-18 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-18 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-18 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-03-04 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-04 | House Filed |