AR HB1915 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB1915 is now Act 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB1915 is now Act 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Department Of Human Services And The Department Of Arkansas State Police To Provide Reports Concerning The Number Of Overturned True Finding Determinations.
Title
To Require The Department Of Human Services And The Department Of Arkansas State Police To Provide Reports Concerning The Number Of Overturned True Finding Determinations.
Sponsors
Rep. Mickey Gates [R] | Sen. Alan Clark [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Rep. Grant Hodges [R] |
Sen. John Cooper [R] | Rep. Robin Lundstrum [R] | Rep. Michelle Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Notification that HB1915 is now Act 1025 |
2017-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |