AR HB1910 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1910 is now Act 864
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Notification that HB1910 is now Act 864
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For Certificates Of Indebtedness Under The Arkansas Tax Procedure Act To Be Published On The Official Website Maintained By The Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration.
Title
To Provide For Certificates Of Indebtedness Under The Arkansas Tax Procedure Act To Be Published On The Official Website Maintained By The Director Of The Department Of Finance And Administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1910 is now Act 864 |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2019-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-05 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed |