AR HB1907 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Notification that HB1907 is now Act 1105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Enable Healthcare Providers To Make Appropriate Billing Decisions That Are In The Best Interest Of Patients; And To Establish The Billing In The Best Interest Of Patients Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Enable Healthcare Providers To Make Appropriate Billing Decisions That Are In The Best Interest Of Patients; And To Establish The Billing In The Best Interest Of Patients Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03HouseNotification that HB1907 is now Act 1105
2021-04-28HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-27HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-27HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2021-04-26HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
2021-04-22HouseRe-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2021-04-22HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-22SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1.
2021-04-22SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-22SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-22SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-20SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-04-15SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-04-15SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-15HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-14HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2021-04-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1907&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1907/HB1907041220211629.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1907/HB1907042220211328.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1105.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1907-S1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1907&rcs=2871&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1907&rcs=3081&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1907&rcs=3137&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback