AR HB1901 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Notification that HB1901 is now Act 1026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Academic Support Scholarship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Academic Support Scholarship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseNotification that HB1901 is now Act 1026
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-10HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-10HouseSenate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
2019-04-05HouseRe-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-05HouseReturned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-04SenateReturned To the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-04SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-03SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-01HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-28HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-25HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-25HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback