AR HB1898 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Notification that HB1898 is now Act 956
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Define "vehicle" As An Extension Of A Person's Home; And To Define The Term "journey" Across All Applicable Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Define "vehicle" As An Extension Of A Person's Home; And To Define The Term "journey" Across All Applicable Laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseNotification that HB1898 is now Act 956
2021-04-22HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-21HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-21HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-21SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-21SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-21SenateMotion for Immediate Consideration.
2021-04-20SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-14SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-14SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-14HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-13HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-08HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback