AR HB1897 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Notification that HB1897 is now Act 990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Notification that HB1897 is now Act 990
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Venous Blood Draws In Connection With A Criminal Offense; And To Amend § 5-65-204.
Title
Concerning Venous Blood Draws In Connection With A Criminal Offense; And To Amend § 5-65-204.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Notification that HB1897 is now Act 990 |
2021-04-23 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-22 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned to the House as Passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-08 | House | Filed |