AR HB1896 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Definition Of "physically Helpless" As That Term Is Used In Regard To Sexual Offenses In The Arkansas Criminal Code.
Title
Concerning The Definition Of "physically Helpless" As That Term Is Used In Regard To Sexual Offenses In The Arkansas Criminal Code.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lowery [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-08 | House | Filed |