AR HB1895 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1895 is now Act 1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that HB1895 is now Act 1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Concealed Carry Of A Handgun By A Concealed Carry Licensee Inside A Courthouse.
Title
Concerning The Concealed Carry Of A Handgun By A Concealed Carry Licensee Inside A Courthouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Notification that HB1895 is now Act 1090 |
2017-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |