AR HB1890 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1890 is now Act 1092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1890 is now Act 1092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Study On The Commercial Application Of Existing Technology To Reclaim And Repurpose Spent Nuclear Fuel Rods.
Title
To Create A Study On The Commercial Application Of Existing Technology To Reclaim And Repurpose Spent Nuclear Fuel Rods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Notification that HB1890 is now Act 1092 |
2021-04-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-04-26 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-08 | House | Filed |