AR HB1888 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1888 is now Act 753
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1888 is now Act 753
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Planning For An Absentee Mayor In Cities Of The First Class, Cities Of The Second Class, And Incorporated Towns.
Title
Concerning Planning For An Absentee Mayor In Cities Of The First Class, Cities Of The Second Class, And Incorporated Towns.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Armstrong [D] | Sen. Stephanie Flowers [D] | Rep. David Whitaker [D] | Rep. Bill Gossage [R] |
Rep. Fonda Hawthorne [D] | Rep. Monte Hodges [D] | Rep. Mike Holcomb [R] | Rep. George McGill [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1888 is now Act 753 |
2013-04-03 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-02 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |