AR HB1880 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize For Issuance A Hispanic Americans License Plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize For Issuance A Hispanic Americans License Plate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-03 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 20 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
2013-04-03HouseRead the third time and failed.
2013-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2013-03-08HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback