AR HB1879 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1879 is now Act 1350
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that HB1879 is now Act 1350
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Issuance Of The Martin Luther King, Jr. License Plate.
Title
To Authorize The Issuance Of The Martin Luther King, Jr. License Plate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Notification that HB1879 is now Act 1350 |
2013-04-17 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-16 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-03 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |